MABLETHORPE AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 September 1994: Standard registration
- MABLETHORPE AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL FUND (Previous name)
- MABLETHORPE AND SUTTON-ON-SEA SWIMMING POOL SUPPORT FUND ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HENRY GEORGE CONYERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ROBERT ROUSSEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM JAMES SUMMERELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.42k | £1.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 2 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED 17 AUGUST 1994, 26TH OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(1) PROVIDE SWIMMING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MABLETHORPE AND SUTTON-ON-SEA AND SURROUNDING AREA IN LINCOLNSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, AGE, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (2) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SWIMMING POOL AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; AND (3) PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Huttoft Road
Sutton-on-Sea
Mablethorpe
LN12 2QY
- Phone:
- 01507441195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window