ROSEBERRY ACADEMY FRIENDS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 1040735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.65k £5.62k £6.74k £17.62k £3.78k
Total expenditure £9.12k £6.90k £3.66k £19.33k £5.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A