Accounts and annual returns THE BISHOP AUCKLAND MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1040743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required