Financial history THE BISHOP AUCKLAND MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1040743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £8.40k £8.27k £7.36k £9.03k £5.65k
Total expenditure £7.96k £9.79k £9.38k £8.16k £2.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A