Trustees PLACE2BE

Charity number: 1040756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Mackenzie-Smith Chair 12 June 2017
None on record
Osama Khan Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Timothy Robinson Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Richard Douglas Trustee 08 June 2022
DEMELZA HOSPICE CARE FOR CHILDREN
Received: On time
Anuja Ravindra Dhir QC Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Aamir Ahmad Trustee 22 July 2020
None on record
John Murphy Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
Margaret Murphy Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
Alexander Begbie CBE Trustee 17 September 2018
None on record
Professor STEPHEN SCOTT Trustee 20 June 2016
PSYCHIATRY RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHILD AND ADOLESCENT MENTAL HEALTH
Received: On time
Elizabeth Greetham Trustee 20 June 2016
None on record
Sian Hill Trustee 08 July 2014
None on record
CHARLIE MAYFIELD MBA Trustee 17 June 2014
THE PRODUCTIVITY GROUP
Received: On time
ADRIAN JOSEPH LEVY Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
ELPHA MARY LECOINTE Trustee
None on record