Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST ENDELLION CHURCH

Charity number: 1040774
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 March 2023 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 June 2021 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 June 2021 500 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required