THE FRIENDS OF ST ENDELLION CHURCH

Charity number: 1040774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANE ELIZABETH COOMBES Trustee
EXETER DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID Received: On time
ROBIN FRANK ROWLAND Chair 24 August 2014 None on record
Andrew Lewis Trustee 07 July 2018 None on record
Rev Judith Pollinger Trustee 07 April 2018 None on record
DAVID HUGH CRADDOCK Trustee 24 August 2014 None on record
Peter Rapsey Trustee 29 August 2020 None on record
DR DAVID RONALD EDWARDS Trustee None on record
SUSAN FOSTER Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
FRANCES ROBERTA KENT Trustee None on record
DAVID JOHN FOSTER Trustee 24 August 2014 None on record
LT COL K LAWTON Trustee 04 April 2012 None on record
REV ELIZABETH JANE WILD Trustee 07 January 2016
ENDELIENTA Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MINVER TOGETHER WITH ST ENODOC AND ST MICHAEL Received: On time
Patricia Hardman Trustee 27 August 2017 None on record