Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF ROMSEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1040846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 May 2022 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 February 2022 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 February 2021 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required