Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF ROMSEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1040846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £24.52k £18.50k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £15.23k £24.13k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A