Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY CHURCH SHEPPEY
Charity number: 1040881

Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 39 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 39 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 22 August 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 22 August 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window