Accounts and annual returns BOURNE ABBEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1040896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window