Accounts and annual returns BLACKLANDS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 January 2021 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required