BASINGSTOKE CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041051
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £2.64k £3.19k £2 £0 £12
Total expenditure £1.96k £2.35k £113 £120 £47
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A