THE SCIENCE FICTION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains and develops a science fiction research collection and library. Raises funds to support the Foundation Collection. Publishes the Journal Foundation: The International Review of Science Fiction. Organises and supports conferences for the furtherance of Science Fiction education. Publishes papers, pamphlets and books on the subject of Science Fiction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1994: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Paul Sleight | Chair | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Una Mary McCormack | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Sawyer | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charul Dinesh Palmer-Patel | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
William George Slocombe | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shana Sandlin Worthen | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANNES BROWN | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN CLUTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR Edward Frederick JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Paul Dormer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.90k | £9.47k | £7.44k | £12.04k | £6.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.31k | £7.71k | £7.96k | £8.24k | £8.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF A SCIENCE FICTION RESEARCH COLLECTION AND LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 ST. JOHNS ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU2 7UH
- Phone:
- 01483575822
- Email:
- treasurer@sf-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window