Accounts and annual returns BODMIN ROAD COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1041093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required