Trustees BODMIN ROAD COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1041093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
marie mccarthy Chair 12 February 2013
None on record
Alison Mary Twist Trustee 10 February 2017
LIVERPOOL NORTH CENTRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
BRONWYN DONOHOE Trustee 15 November 2016
None on record
irene woods Trustee 27 November 2015
None on record
lyndsey harrison Trustee 27 November 2015
None on record
JANET GRANEY Trustee 05 June 2011
None on record