CALDECOTE CE ACADEMY PTFA

Charity number: 1041159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required