CALDECOTE CE ACADEMY PTFA

Charity number: 1041159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.38k £4.81k £8.86k £10.37k £5.83k
Total expenditure £2.96k £4.71k £8.18k £9.28k £8.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A