Trustees CALDECOTE CE ACADEMY PTFA
Charity number: 1041159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Leftwich | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Tozer | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Ford | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Helen Baker | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ivy Margaret Johns | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARY SPENCER | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Emmaline Maudlin | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.