Accounts and annual returns ST BERNADETTES ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 November 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required