Financial history SOUTH WESTERN LARYNGOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.36k £4.20k £2.34k £3.10k £2.04k
Total expenditure £6.00k £4.56k £1.49k £5.80k £392
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A