TEIFI VALLEY RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1041218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 March 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 March 2017 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required