SUNFLOWER PRESCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School operating for children from 2 years till 4 years old. Children take part in a range of activities. The approach is very child centred with a focus on developing the whole child through play. The pre-school is linked to Camerton Church School and is part of the community of Camerton village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- North Somerset
Governance
- 05 October 1994: Standard registration
- 15 January 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- SUNFLOWER PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.59k | £18.95k | £12.52k | £19.38k | £33.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.23k | £19.90k | £14.50k | £17.11k | £25.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 09 January 2013 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 09 January 2013 | 193 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 13 September 2011 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 29 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 29 March 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1994, AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTISE CAMERTON AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window