DONOR CONCEPTION NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting families contemplating donor conception treatment and those who have had children by donor conception
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People
7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 October 1994: Standard registration
- DC NETWORK (Working name)
- D I NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Dean | Chair | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Marx | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Drinkwater | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Isaacs | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Amies-Cull | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Wall | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gundesen | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.49k | £259.87k | £241.41k | £250.56k | £248.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.70k | £249.07k | £253.33k | £213.86k | £249.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 24 May 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 29 May 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HUMAN FERTILITY, FERTILISATION AND EMBRYOLOGY, ASSISTED CONCEPTION, GENETICS AND THE IMPACT OF NON GENETIC RELATIONSHIPS BY THE PROVISION TO PARENTS OF CHILDREN CONCEIVED BY D I (DONOR INSEMINATION) OR BY EGG DONATION, TO THE CHILDREN THEMSELVES, AND TO THOSE CONTEMPLATING OR UNDERGOING TREATMENT, OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Donor Conception Network
154 Caledonian Road
LONDON
N1 9RD
- Phone:
- 02072782608
- Email:
- enquiries@dcnetwork.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window