Accounts and annual returns MARY HARE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 18 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required