Financial history The Family Mediation Trust

Charity number: 1041476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £205.61k £201.67k £196.76k £251.43k £320.40k
Total expenditure £217.78k £181.10k £188.23k £217.57k £306.02k
Income from government contracts £110.62k £102.77k £104.30k £120.16k £172.55k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £12.26k