WHITTINGTON AND OSWESTRY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1041496
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 July 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 July 2019 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 November 2018 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 June 2019 355 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 July 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 July 2017 26 days late Download