Accounts and annual returns ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS HIGH SCHOOL GOVERNORS' CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1041567
Charity reporting is overdue by 754 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 389 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 389 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 754 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 754 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required