Financial history ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS HIGH SCHOOL GOVERNORS' CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1041567
Charity reporting is overdue by 719 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £41.87k £15.00k £293 £165 £142
Total expenditure £15.04k £44.70k £525 £475 £50.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A