WORKAID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity based in Chesham, Buckinghamshire empowering young people in Africa (and the UK) to help themselves by developing the skills and knowledge needed to find gainful employment or start their own business. We refurbish donated tools to a high standard and ship them to training centres and self-help organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
176 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 22 October 1994: Standard registration
- WORKAID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Vellacott | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Bellingham | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martha Ware | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert James Levine | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Joseph Chidgey | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Stephen Moores | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peter Quentin Canham | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth George Wilcock | Trustee | 17 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £438.90k | £405.28k | £496.36k | £483.46k | £411.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £455.76k | £363.39k | £467.00k | £556.54k | £540.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.60k | £56.35k | £15.52k | £3.26k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 April 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24 JAN 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 JULY 1994, 5 MARCH 1998, 8 JUNE 2010 AND 27 JULY 2010. as amended on 24 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DESTITUTION AND THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL AID TO THOSE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, FAMINE AND DISEASE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND TO THIS END TO PROVIDE TOOLS AND EQUIPMENT WHICH MAY BE NEEDED TO COMBAT ANY OF THE FOREGOING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Workaid
The Old Boot Factory
71 Townsend Road
Chesham
HP5 2AA
- Phone:
- 01494775220
- Email:
- admin@workaid.org
- Website:
-
workaid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window