THE ARBEIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1041609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.54k £5.72k £1.78k £4.81k £397
Total expenditure £1.20k £5.48k £2.74k £1.84k £3.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A