Financial history FRIENDS OF TAVERNSPITE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1041679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £4.35k £5.30k £2.71k £2.23k £6.27k
Total expenditure £3.15k £7.04k £1.76k £2.32k £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A