THE WHEELERS AND WOBBLERS SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB FOR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY

Charity number: 1041688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Wheelers & Wobblers are a self-funded, volunteer led disabled sports and social charity that meet on Wednesday in Cluntergate Community Centre, Horbury. We provide various fun events, chair exercises, arts & crafts and games to keep us active and provide training for many competitions in sports including bowls, boccia, snooker and table-tennis. We also have a full programme of wellbeing events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,537
Total expenditure: £9,374

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • W W S S C (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Leighton Chair
None on record
Simon Ingham Trustee 17 January 2014
None on record
SARAH INGHAM Trustee 17 January 2014
None on record
Julie Godfrey Trustee 05 September 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.35k £7.97k £2.00k £8.19k £4.54k
Total expenditure £14.38k £1.08k £487 £5.88k £9.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 April 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 April 2023 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Green Lane
Horbury
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF4 5DZ
Phone:
07813019150
Website:

No information available