Financial history ST. MARY'S DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1041737
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £275.83k £274.93k £296.36k £242.06k £242.90k
Total expenditure £720.03k £578.48k £42.55k £629.70k £203.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A