Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, BRIXHAM

Charity number: 1041867
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.61k £6.19k £6.33k £6.77k £375
Total expenditure £1.64k £1.84k £0 £0 £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A