YMCA St Paul's Group

Charity number: 1041923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.09m £18.01m £25.61m £25.74m £23.72m
Total expenditure £16.46m £16.91m £23.56m £24.92m £23.37m
Income from government contracts £906.39k £753.92k N/A £1 £4.15m
Income from government grants £795.04k £448.39k N/A £1 £2.11m
Income - Donations and legacies £68.65k £29.38k £21.63k £20.01k £40.39k
Income - Other trading activities £371.21k £586.08k £580.38k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.93m £16.63m £24.01m £25.68m £23.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.26k £28.88k £35.24k £40.02k £463
Income - Other £696.25k £742.03k £954.56k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.32m £16.77m £23.55m £24.90m £23.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £141.35k £143.25k £2.11k £15.11k £0
Expenditure - Governance £180.60k £210.60k £211.82k £63.07k £68.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.10k £1.15k £1.14k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0