RISLEY MOSS ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer group dedicated to support the ranger service at Risley Moss Local Nature Reserve. Lead events held at Risley Moss including walks, talks and craft activities eg building bird feeders and nesting boxes. Risley Moss is one of the few remaining mosslands in Cheshire.It is a Site of Special Scientific interest and a designated Local Nature Reserve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 07 November 1994: Standard registration
- R I M A G (Working name)
- RIMAG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Speake | Chair | 08 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Paul Kemp | Trustee | 22 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG MICHAEL CONKERTON | Trustee | 08 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GILBERT REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDY PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £34 | £48 | £33 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83k | £0 | £274 | £580 | £563 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
A) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE AREA KNOWN AS RISLEY MOSS NATURE RESERVE IN THE BOROUGH OF WARRINGTON B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ECOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF RISLEY MOSS NATURE RESERVE
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WARRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 STONEHAVEN DRIVE
FEARNHEAD
WARRINGTON
WA2 0SR
- Phone:
- 07785331197
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
rimag.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window