THE SELBY TRUST

Charity number: 1042095
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT DANSO Trustee 07 September 2018
TEMPLE OF REFUGE MINISTRIES Received: On time
Mike Hakata Trustee 16 July 2018 None on record
Dr Victor Olisa QPM Trustee 15 December 2017
TRELOAR TRUST Received: On time
SURREY COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
Stella Nwimo Trustee 02 June 2015 None on record
Lucia Das Neves Trustee 16 August 2018 None on record
Sophie Fitzsimmons Trustee 07 September 2018 None on record
Anne Stennett Cllr Trustee 05 June 2015
ALEXANDRA PARK AND PALACE Received: On time
Edward Ihejirika Chair 02 June 2015 None on record
Jonathan Clarke Trustee 18 November 2013 None on record