Financial history BIRDLIFE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1042125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £22.29m £21.84m £22.99m £26.17m £24.31m
Total expenditure £19.65m £20.63m £23.12m £23.02m £24.74m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £415.40k £477.91k £223.16k £163.51k £117.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.27m £2.38m £4.13m £4.66m £5.39m
Income - Other trading activities £1.07m £1.24m £1.21m £127.88k £196.88k
Income - Charitable activities £18.76m £18.09m £17.49m £21.29m £18.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £150.03k £88.24k £119.45k £60.49k £66.54k
Income - Other £39.77k £38.17k £44.02k £34.90k £24.24k
Income - Legacies £15.83k £62.43k £278.64k £724.59k £681.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.62m £19.58m £22.21m £22.23m £23.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £824.91k £1.05m £912.62k £797.62k £944.55k
Expenditure - Governance £304.47k £430.76k £473.96k £338.43k £278.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.29m £7.50m £7.65m £8.62m £8.83m
Expenditure - Investment management £45.03k £39.49k £31.82k £13.02k £25.52k
Expenditure - Other £208.48k £0 £0 £0 £0