Trustees BIRDLIFE INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1042125

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GREGORY | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Christie Constantine | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fadi Naseer | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dian Agista Prihanggalasari | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jean Vine | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kjetil Aadne Solbakken | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nunia Teresa Thomas | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rabindra Vikash Vanapalli Tatayah | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Khadija Bourass | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ishana Thapa | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lieven de Schamphelaere | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rodrigo Wilber Soria Auza | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sheku Kamara | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Philip Birch | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rosalia Acosta | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Susan Speight | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Raymond Couturier | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alfred duPont Chandler III | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rye | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.