Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH ALVERSTOKE

Charity number: 1042305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £8.78k £5.99k £7.70k £5.54k £6.82k
Total expenditure £983 £2.00k £0 £2.79k £3.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A