TOIRAS MOISHE TALMUDICAL ACADEMY (COLLEL AND YESHIVO) CHASSAM SOFER TRUST

Charity number: 1042314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 01 December 1994: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 14 October 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 April 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property