Financial history COMMUNITY SECURITY TRUST

Charity number: 1042391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.20m £20.92m £20.53m £11.31m £23.53m
Total expenditure £19.76m £20.49m £21.16m £11.85m £21.89m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.40m £13.40m £14.00m £7.57m £15.99m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.22m £6.97m £6.00m £2.96m £7.03m
Income - Other trading activities £440.59k £440.59k £0 £302.59k £286.08k
Income - Charitable activities £13.40m £13.40m £14.00m £7.57m £15.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £140.00k £0
Income - Investment £137.79k £111.71k £0 £97.82k £50.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £532.89k £385.79k £200.59k
Income - Legacies £0 £532.77k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.92m £20.49m £20.61m £11.60m £21.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £843.09k £0 £548.56k £246.41k £582.41k
Expenditure - Governance £1.93m £1.11m £0 £57.43k £66.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £13.40m £13.40m £13.60m £7.46m £15.99m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0