Financial history THE FRIENDS OF FREEZYWATER ST GEORGES C.E. SCHOOL ENFIELD

Charity number: 1042406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.53k £6.31k £4.66k £2.46k £23
Total expenditure £6.64k £7.02k £7.80k £5.20k £468
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A