Financial history LIFESHARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1042500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £104.08k £193.55k £193.55k £325.48k £372.28k
Total expenditure £133.68k £171.96k £171.96k £248.88k £356.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A