NEWARK YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1042538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 October 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required