NEWARK YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1042538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £13.78k £15.41k £14.27k £15.94k £11.86k
Total expenditure £11.51k £13.08k £15.27k £13.27k £6.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A