MUSIC THEATRE KERNOW

Charity number: 1042568
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 22 July 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 16 August 2017 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required