COX GREEN SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1042583
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PTA ORGANISING EVENTS TO RAISE FUNDS FOR SCHOOL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £2,117

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1994: Standard registration
  • 07 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £3.21k £2.75k £2.61k £1.87k £0
Total expenditure £3.82k £5.20k £2.69k £1.76k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 September 2018 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required