Accounts and annual returns 1ST MARKFIELD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1042586
Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 December 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required